JOHN GRIFFITH'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To aid, by financial means, the broad education of young people who live in, or are visitors to Newtown Powys.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 25 March 1981: Standard registration
- 25 February 2008: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31 | £58 | £750 | £221 | |
|
Total expenditure | £100 | £150 | £744 | £650 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 10 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 21 September 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 22 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 01 November 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 21 OCTOBER 1980 AS VARIED BY MODIFICATION ORDER OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE MADE 18 NOVEMBER 1983 AND AFFECTED BY ORDER MADE FOR CHARITY 234375 DATED 6 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THEB EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH IN WALES INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHICAL TRAINING OF POOR BOYS WHO OR WHOSE PARENTS ARE RESIDENT IN NEWTOWN OR ITS VICINITY.FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE MODIFICATION ORDER OF 18 NOVEMBER 1983
Area of benefit
NEWTOWN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window