ACEACTIVE MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aceactive Ministry exists to share the Gospel in a fun active way for example with school children we engage them in games using a Gladiator theme as to how Jesus set the captives free. With older groups we interact in communities with family fundays, mens breakfasts, curry nights, with a Christian message of hope. We also work in prison ministry giving a positive message of change by faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Brazil
Governance
- 23 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALLAN ASHWORTH | Chair | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Mark Sewell | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Cyril Farrar | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Lynn Barnett | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony john scott | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Barwick | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Jennifer Russ | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.68k | £68.82k | £67.05k | £68.81k | £49.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.55k | £44.62k | £47.35k | £49.13k | £50.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN THE BIBLE. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MEANS OF BROADCASTING MESSAGES OF AN EVANGELISTIC AND TEACHING NATURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. FRANCIS PARSONAGE
DALGARNO WAY
LONDON
W10 5EL
- Phone:
- 07864108179
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
aceactive.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window