Financial history POYNTON YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1176009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £68.87k £71.00k £63.03k £77.48k £83.00k
Total expenditure £35.43k £36.00k £28.00k £101.80k £56.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £31.00k £8.00k N/A N/A