SOUL SANCTUARY GOSPEL CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SSGC's purposes are the advancement of the Christian faith, of arts and culture, and of education in music. To this end, it provides a high-quality gospel choir that composes, rehearses and performs gospel music in a range of venues and contexts. Through various initiatives and resources, it is also a provider of education for the public in the creation and performance of gospel music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
43 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAL GIEDROYC | Chair | 18 December 2017 |
|
|||||
Francis Christian Parham | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nonyelum Emma Ajuonuma | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL ABENA AFRAKOMA OWUSU-AGYEI | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE BULLOCK | Trustee | 18 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev THOMAS GILLUM | Trustee | 18 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOHN MOFFATT SJ | Trustee | 18 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.56k | £14.14k | £35.99k | £39.47k | £52.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.25k | £23.98k | £24.21k | £42.85k | £50.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ART OF MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, GOSPEL MUSIC; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF MUSIC, PARTICULARLY (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) GOSPEL MUSIC. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 89
Prince of Wales Mansions
Prince of Wales Drive
London
SW11 4BL
- Phone:
- 07982441536
- Email:
- info@soulsanctuarygospel.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window