THE ALVIS ARCHIVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects are, for the public benefit, to obtain and preserve the heritage of, and any objects, information or data of historical interest relevant to; Alvis, the Alvis company or related personalities of any era; and/or promote the study and appreciation of the history and heritage of Alvis products as items of historical interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 September 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Clive Wickham MBE | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edmund Waterhouse | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Leigh Wrapson | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Ronald Fox | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.93k | £3.17k | £15.97k | £6.19k | £6.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £516 | £4.80k | £7.86k | £6.18k | £5.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Sep 2018 as amended on 25 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO: 3.1 OBTAIN AND PRESERVE THE HERITAGE OF, AND ANY OBJECTS, INFORMATION OR DATA OF HISTORICAL INTEREST RELEVANT TO, ALVIS CARS AND PRODUCTS, THE ALVIS COMPANY OR RELATED PERSONALITIES OF ANY ERA; AND/OR 3.2 PROMOTE THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION OF THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF ALVIS CARS AND PRODUCTS AS ITEMS OF HISTORICAL INTEREST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Field Lane
Normanby-By-Spital
MARKET RASEN
Lincolnshire
LN8 2HB
- Phone:
- 01673 878148
- Email:
- alvisarchive@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window