LIFE IN ABUNDANCE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LIA International, a faith-based community development organisation, empowers the local church in 14 countries to break the cycle of poverty within the poorest & most marginalised communities by restoring health, renewing hope & inspiring lasting transformation. Our unique Transformational Development Model brings about changes within the spiritual, social & material dimensions of a community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Burundi
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Djibouti
- Egypt
- Eritrea
- Ethiopia
- Haiti
- Jamaica
- Kenya
- Rwanda
- Somalia
- South Sudan
- Sudan
- Uganda
Governance
- 20 March 2018: CIO registration
- LIA INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Conrad Edson St John Nevers | Chair | 20 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Pearl Tsui | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
The Lady Andrea Lenzie | Trustee | 25 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Paul Lamb | Trustee | 20 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bakibinga | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Florence Ndinda Muindi | Trustee | 14 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Addo | Trustee | 09 February 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.61k | £63.07k | £90.09k | £83.56k | £112.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.08k | £89.69k | £85.91k | £60.76k | £105.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.86k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2018 as amended on 17 Oct 2022 as amended on 17 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG WOMEN AND CHILDREN IN NEED, IN AFRICA AND IN OTHER SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manvers Street Baptist Church
Manvers Street
BATH
BA1 1JW
- Phone:
- 07954 144771
- Email:
- infoUK@lifeinabundance.org
- Website:
-
lifeinabundance.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window