THE SPADE HAMMER AND PEN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Spade Hammer Pen was originally set up in the 70's offering a meeting place to promote the leisure, social, and recreational activities for African Carribean people in the Erdington Area of B,ham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 13 April 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT BARNETT | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PERCIVAL PATTERSON | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR CALVIN MARSHALL | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | £0 | £872 | £2.07k | £4.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £0 | £9.74k | £8.71k | £7.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 466 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 831 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 831 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1196 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1196 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1561 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1561 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/03/1981
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O 36 IVY ROAD
HANDSWORTH
BIRMINGHAM
B21 9AP
- Phone:
- 01214063093
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window