Trustees THE WITHERNSEA LIGHTHOUSE CIO
Charity number: 1178912

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr BRIAN WELLS | Chair | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Speck | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Darren Hickey | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Medcalf | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Frederick Sindall | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eric Doudu | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Gallagher | Trustee | 16 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM STEPHENSON | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN SPECK | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET READ | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN PHILLIPS | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
TERRENCE BEARPARK | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.