THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY WITH ST. JOHN, MICKLEGATE AND ST. MARTIN CUM GREGORY, YORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holy Trinity Church is a Church of England parish church in York city centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of York
Governance
- 22 January 2018: Standard registration
- HOLY TRINITY MICKLEGATE PCC (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Simon Askey | Chair | 22 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Crawford | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lionel Stock | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Webster | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Hornby | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE WORSLEY | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.56k | £169.13k | £172.97k | £93.50k | £70.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217.88k | £137.32k | £215.40k | £95.89k | £41.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £9.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 March 2025 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 March 2025 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 March 2025 | 506 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
20 March 2025 | 506 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 November 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 November 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
81 Burton Stone Lane
York
NIL
NIL
YO30 6BZ
- Phone:
- 01904349633
- Email:
- holytrinityyork@outlook.com
- Website:
-
holytrinitymicklegate.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window