MANCHESTER JAME MASJID AND CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Weekly programs, Evening Madrasah class for Children boys and girls Mon- Friday , Junior Muslim Circle For English speaking Girls (age 8 to 12yrs every Sunday, Junior Muslim Circle For English speaking Boys (age 8-12yrs) every Sunday , Muslimat Circle. For English speaking Girls (age 12-18yrs every Sunday
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 12 February 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SYED BADRUL ALAM | Chair | 12 February 2018 |
|
|||||
ABU SAYEED MOHAMMED JAMAL KHAN | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr ABUL KHAIR MOHAMMAD DILDER CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMAD AMINUR RAHMAN CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 12 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.60k | £57.75k | £56.50k | £60.15k | £71.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.47k | £35.36k | £36.71k | £50.52k | £88.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.55k | £4.01k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 March 2025 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 March 2025 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
'THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE: (I) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH IN LONGSIGHT, MANCHESTER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE QURAN AND SUNNAH INCLUDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND THROUGH THE HOLDING PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES AND PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS. (II) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (III) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF MANCHESTER CITY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.'
Contact information
- Address:
-
50A BIRCH LANE
MANCHESTER
M13 0WN
- Phone:
- 07305605098
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window