MUSEUM OF TIMEKEEPING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Museum of Timekeeping holds for public benefit a collection and library to inspire and promote public understanding and appreciation of horology and the history, science, art and craft of timekeeping, by collecting, documenting, preserving, exhibiting and interpreting a collection and library to promote public enjoyment and understanding through exhibitions, public & educational programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- BHI MUSEUM TRUST. (Working name)
- BRITISH HOROLOGICAL INSTITUTE MUSEUM TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Powell | Chair | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Reginald John Griffths | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Martyn Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Jan Wright | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BENTLEY LOOMES | Trustee | 03 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ARNFIELD | Trustee | 03 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUSTIN JAY KOULLAPIS | Trustee | 03 January 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.98k | £19.49k | £44.40k | £40.26k | £45.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £218.88k | £87.64k | £94.39k | £126.45k | £135.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £21.74k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 151 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY, ART, CRAFT AND SCIENCE OF HOROLOGY AND TIMEKEEPING
Contact information
- Address:
-
Upton Hall
Main Street
Upton
Newark on Trent
Nottingh
- Phone:
- 01636817601
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window