OAKWOOD TENNIS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing facilities to play tennis all year round.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GAVIN NELSON | Chair | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
EMMA NELSON | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
NEIL BIDDLE | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUE BERESFORD | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | 01/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.61k | £46.93k | £53.82k | £58.90k | £53.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.24k | £77.99k | £32.37k | £54.51k | £26.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 May 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 28 June 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | 28 June 2024 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 19 June 2022 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | 19 June 2022 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 02 June 2021 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2020 | 02 June 2021 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF OAKWOOD TENNIS CLUB IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTH RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITY FOR THE PLAYING OF TENNIS
Contact information
- Address:
-
243 BRAMPTON ROAD
BEXLEYHEATH
DA7 4SS
- Phone:
- 07843325329
- Email:
- admin@oakwoodtennisclub.com
- Website:
-
oakwoodtennisclub.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window