Financial history NOTTINGHAMSHIRE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 511288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £763.88k £698.95k £463.75k £380.58k £639.49k
Total expenditure £600.66k £537.93k £561.08k £651.63k £598.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £150.67k £40.79k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £595.96k £653.06k N/A N/A £489.38k
Income - Other trading activities £141.59k £34.98k N/A N/A £111.25k
Income - Charitable activities £22.97k £8.08k N/A N/A £34.77k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £3.37k £2.83k N/A N/A £4.08k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £377.29k £306.79k N/A N/A £116.55k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £418.29k £391.51k N/A N/A £451.41k
Expenditure - Raising funds £182.38k £146.42k N/A N/A £147.33k
Expenditure - Governance £1.55k £3.23k N/A N/A £3.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £0