THE FRIENDS OF DARLINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To bring comfort to patients and brighten their lives; To Help and encourage staff and enhance the good reputation of the Hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Darlington
Governance
- 01 April 1981: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF THE DARLINGTON HOSPITALS (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF THE DARLINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR ALAN CHARLTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DAVID LISTER | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ann Lunn | Trustee | 28 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
LEWIS STOCKILL | Trustee | 22 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEANETTE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALASDAIR MACCONACHIE OBE, DL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOLLY ANN DAVISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Simon Rossinelli | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.19k | £61.24k | £59.79k | £53.81k | £72.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.71k | £45.86k | £57.59k | £74.42k | £76.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 06 March 2022 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 06 March 2022 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 06 March 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 06 March 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MARCH 1981 AS AMENDED 15 MAY 1991 AND 12 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF DARLINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FRIENDS OF DARLINGTON
MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
HOLLYHURST ROAD
DARLINGTON
DL3 6HX
- Phone:
- 01325743866
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window