WOW YOUTH MUSICAL THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WOW develops the confidence, team work and talent of young people in the Weymouth area by giving them opportunities to rehearse and stage musical theatre productions under the direction of a professional creative team.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 02 January 2018: CIO registration
- 09 April 2019: Funds received from 1027440 WOW YOUTH MUSICAL THEATRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN MCKECHAN | Chair | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Cecil | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jean Beth Baldwin | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE JANE MOORE | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA LUCKEN | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANET MAUREEN STOCKLEY | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTIE PURNELL | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
RODNEY RUSSEL PATTINSON | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA BRUNELL | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Hurdiss | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ZOE STOCKLEY | Trustee | 02 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.15k | £6.10k | £36.46k | £98.48k | £143.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.11k | £24.50k | £20.55k | £95.02k | £124.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.40k | £1.84k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS BETWEEN THE AGES OF 10 AND 18 YEARS IN THE DRAMATIC AND MUSICAL ARTS AND TO FURTHER ANY EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wow Youth Musical Theatre
25-27 Park Street
WEYMOUTH
Dorset
DT4 7DF
- Phone:
- 01305 457997
- Email:
- info@wowyouththeatre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window