FARNLEY FALCONS ARLFC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur sports club providing sporting activities for children and adults in the Leeds area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income includes £103,146 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
84 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leeds City
Governance
- 01 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADAM HARRISON | Chair | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Fletcher | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Gilbert | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN VETTOREL | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN ADAMS | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME PATTENDEN | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS STANILAND | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.46k | £50.04k | £17.94k | £138.45k | £192.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.39k | £43.73k | £21.34k | £37.33k | £275.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £95.00k | £103.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 184 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 150 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 January 2021 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 January 2021 | 89 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND COACHING FOR RUGBY LEAGUE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Nest
Butt Lane
LEEDS
LS12 5BD
- Phone:
- 07455152323
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window