NOOR WELLBEING ASSOCIATION


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
-
Notice of dissolution on application of the CIO (see details)
The Commission intends to dissolve this CIO after three months from the date of this notice unless cause is shown to the contrary. Representations must be made to the Commission within three months. Email your representation to CIOnotices@charitycommission.gov.uk
Quote the charity number and head the email 'CIO dissolution representation'.
Notice dated: 30 April 2025
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Noor Wellbeing Association is a non profit charity aiming to alleviate poverty in Afghanistan. Day by day the situation in Afghanistan is deteriorating and as a charity we strongly believe the key to social mobility and progress is education and this is why our main methods in improving the current state of Afghanistan is to educate the future generations. Our website: noorwellbeing.com
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 February 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Afghanistan
Governance
- 02 July 2018: CIO registration
- NOOR CHARITY (Previous name)
- NOOR WELFARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AREFULLAH FATIH | Chair | 25 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Khan Agha Fathi | Trustee | 15 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
ABDULLAH TARAKAI | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
FAWZIA SHUKOR | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH FATIH | Trustee | 16 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
NASRTULLAH FATIH | Trustee | 01 January 2011 |
|
|
||||
HAMIDULLA KESHTMAND | Trustee | 01 January 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/02/2019 | 27/02/2020 | 27/02/2021 | 27/02/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.04k | £249 | £6.42k | £2.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £799 | £4.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 127 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 127 days | |
Annual return | 27 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 493 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 493 days | |
Annual return | 27 February 2022 | 12 October 2023 | 289 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2022 | 12 October 2023 | 289 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 February 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2021 | 19 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 February 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
27 February 2020
(These accounts |
30 January 2021 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND A STRICT EMPHASIS ON THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN AFGHANISTAN WITH A FOCUS ON THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN, THOSE WIDOWED AND OTHERS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Lime Tree Road
HOUNSLOW
TW5 0TD
- Phone:
- 07876795586
- Email:
- Noorwellbeing@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window