THE FAVELA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Increasing access to education and social welfare in favela's in Brazil, by giving financial support and grants to locally run projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Brazil
Governance
- 21 May 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICK ALEXANDER SOMERSET GIBBS | Chair | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ann Marie Wechter | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Flavia Delfina Cintra Franco | Trustee | 03 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW JOSEPH SMITH | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
KANAV GAURAV GUPTA | Trustee | 17 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.03k | £31.71k | £26.69k | £13.09k | £19.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.30k | £31.87k | £16.97k | £24.37k | £8.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 May 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE COMMUNITIES OF THE FAVELAS OF BRAZIL, IN PARTICULAR THOSE LIVING IN THE MUNICIPALITY OF RIO DE JANEIRO.
Contact information
- Address:
-
137 MARTIN WAY
MORDEN
SM4 4AR
- Phone:
- 07531170078
- Email:
- info@thefavelafoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window