PANG VALLEY FLOOD FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Develop and monitor the local Flood Risk Management Action Plan Raise awareness of local flood risks before, during and after any event within the communities via Parish Newsletters, community meetings, social media etc. Review the flood risk management authorities' policies and make recommendations for change if appropriate Support the environmental objectives of the Water Framework Directive.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 14 December 2017: CIO registration
- PVFF (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAY LACEY | Chair | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Lynn Mitchell | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Davis | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
PIERS MICHAEL DOUGLAS ALLISON | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN JOHN CONNORTON | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN BILLYEALD | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.62k | £26.92k | £8.65k | £350 | £647 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.87k | £26.94k | £2.50k | £768 | £801 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.62k | £26.27k | £3.25k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 14 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY, THE PRESERVATION OF HUMAN LIFE AND PROPERTY AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ENVIRONMENT TO PROVIDE, PRESERVE, MAINTAIN, RESTORE AND/OR IMPROVE FLOOD DEFENCES AND FLOOD PROTECTION MEASURES AND FLOOD DAMAGE REMEDIATION IN PARTICULAR IN THE COMMUNITIES ALONG THE RIVER PANG AND THE SULHAM BROOK, PRINCIPALLY IN THE COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 BRIARS CLOSE
PANGBOURNE
READING
RG8 7LH
- Phone:
- 01189843368
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window