VINE CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES THE GLORIOUS CHURCH LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running a church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 16 January 2018: Standard registration
- VINEYARD CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES THE GLORIOUS CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IGBEKLE JULIUS OSA-ONI | Chair | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
NATHAN FREDERICK MORGAN | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
CASSANDRA GROOTE | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
ISOKEN OSA-ONI | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNNS TOKEE-OPITOKE | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.23k | £11.50k | £2.01k | £12.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.34k | £11.85k | £13.85k | £12.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 402 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 402 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 351 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 MAY 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 NOV 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 20 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY HOLDING MEETINGS, LECTURES, TEACHING OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS, PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE AND OTHER ARTICLES OF FAITH AND ENLIGHTENING OTHERS ABOUT THE FAITH
Contact information
- Address:
-
91 KENYON LANE
MANCHESTER
M40 9JN
- Phone:
- 07886192576
- Email:
- osaonijul@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window