DIFFERENT PLANET ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We produce sensory theatre and immersive arts experiences for children and young people with complex disabilities. We work in theatres, arts centers, schools, hospitals, and community settings to create events and experiences in which we facilitate participants to co-create and play. We are an artist-led charity that promotes inclusion and empowerment through imagination and participation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £22,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- Kent
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 05 November 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Rosalind Hall | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Vanessa Dell | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Deborah Norris | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Rose | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.53k | £37.38k | £36.92k | £52.45k | £55.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.09k | £21.82k | £60.02k | £40.72k | £59.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £200 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £22.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 JUN 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PARTS OF SOCIETY AS A RESULT OF A DISABILITY, ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL) OR POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PERFORMING AND CULTURAL ARTS BASED ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO HELP THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO THE COMMUNITY AND ASSIST THEM IN THEIR DEVELOPMENT AS FULL MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE PERFORMING AND CULTURAL ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITH PERSONS WHO MAY REQUIRE HELP BECAUSE OF A DISABILITY, ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL) OR POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 SPENCES LANE
LEWES
BN7 2HG
- Phone:
- 07711717634
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window