Financial history ASHMOLE PRIMARY PTA ( APPTA)

Charity number: 1176120
Charity reporting is up to date (248 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £24.26k £8.53k £18.90k £22.15k £13.51k
Total expenditure £25.48k £12.50k £6.44k £5.25k £6.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A