Accounts and annual returns OASIS ACADEMY SHIRLEY PARK PRIMARY PTA

Charity number: 1177299
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 January 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 18 January 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 18 January 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 18 January 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 18 January 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 18 January 2020 Not submitted