THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WALTON ON THE HILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote in the parish the whole mission of the church,pastoral,evangelistic,social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 22 December 2017: Standard registration
- ST PETER'S WALTON ON THE HILL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD HENRY NICHOLAS LOMAX LATHAM | Chair | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Luella Anne Edwards | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Jean Gurr | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL JEFFRIES HANCOCK | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
George Thomas Rhind-Tutt | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Thompson | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
George Richard Curry | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Laura Susanne Palmer | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mo Atkins | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|||||
NEIL CRAWFORD WILLIAMS | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANN CATHERINE LIDDLE | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.57k | £113.99k | £108.50k | £119.58k | £253.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.71k | £94.29k | £100.70k | £113.97k | £126.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH,PASTORAL,EVANGELISTIC,SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RECTORY
BREECH LANE
WALTON ON THE HILL
TADWORTH
KT20 7SD
- Phone:
- 01737668254
- Email:
- admin@stpeterswoth.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window