Trustees THE NORTHUMBRIA HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST

Charity number: 511314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Philip Palmer Anderson Chair 10 March 2022
None on record
David Lindsay Harris Trustee 24 October 2024
THE NORTHUMBRIA HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Recently registered
Leanne May Tindle Trustee 24 October 2024
THE NORTHUMBRIA HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Recently registered
JOHN WAUGH MBE Trustee 24 October 2024
THE NORTHUMBRIA HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Recently registered
ST. NICHOLAS' EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
Martin Hulse Trustee 24 October 2024
THE NORTHUMBRIA HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Recently registered
Dennis Peter Parker Trustee 01 November 2022
THE NORTHUMBRIA HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Recently registered
Edward Roman Tulasiewicz Trustee 01 November 2022
THE NORTHUMBRIA HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Recently registered
Matthew Alexander Pentti Sinclair Trustee 01 November 2022
THE NORTHUMBRIA HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Recently registered
Elizabeth Mary Walford Trustee 01 November 2022
THE NORTHUMBRIA HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Recently registered
John Phillip Palmer Anderson Trustee 10 March 2022
THE NORTHUMBRIA HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Recently registered
George William Heslop Trustee 06 February 2018
THE NORTHUMBRIA HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Recently registered
Joanna Pullan Trustee 01 October 2017
THE NORTHUMBRIA HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Recently registered
LAWRENCE MCLEMAN Trustee 01 April 2017
THE NORTHUMBRIA HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST
Recently registered