THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE DIVINE, SELSDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Croydon
Governance
- 27 November 2017: Standard registration
- ST. JOHN THE DIVINE PCC, SELSDON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzannah Jane Victoria Puttock | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Graham | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
SIMON ARCHER | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Graham Harris | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Gugliemi | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
JAMES GORDON | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANICE ELIZABETH WHITE | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev YOUNIS FRANCIS | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN HARLEY | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH ANN BROWN | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN JOHN BROWN | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN MARGARET SHARPE | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ALICE VALERIE HICKS | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ELIZABETH LISHMUND | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR ROBIN THEODORE ORCHARD | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265.12k | £123.44k | £141.71k | £141.71k | £200.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £304.05k | £152.35k | £94.41k | £94.41k | £147.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 February 2024 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 February 2024 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 February 2022 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
01 December 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Church
Upper Selsdon Road
SOUTH CROYDON
CR2 8DD
- Phone:
- 02086579466
- Email:
- bookingsstjohns@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window