THE ANNE ROBSON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Anne Robson Trust works with NHS hospitals to set up and train teams of volunteers, who provide support and companionship to people nearing the end of their life in hospital. The volunteers spend much of their time visiting patients who otherwise face the prospect of dying alone.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 May 2018: Standard registration
- 15 May 2025: Funds received from 286256 THE MARGARET FISHER CHARITABLE TRUST
- THE ANNE ROBSON TUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Peter Cotton | Chair | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helene Williams | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Giuseppe Labriola | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Bain | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Adie | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Michelle Cotter | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.03k | £193.43k | £219.70k | £337.57k | £296.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.12k | £139.40k | £233.72k | £311.58k | £290.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £3.94k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS AND SUFFERING OF INDIVIDUALS AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF END OF LIFE CARE, BY OFFERING PRESENCE, COMPANIONSHIP, COMFORT AND ATTENTION TO THOSE INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE BEEN IDENTIFIED AS AT THE END OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Units A3 and A4
Mindenhall Court
17 High Street
Stevenage
Hertfordshire
SG1 3UN
- Phone:
- 01438 873257
- Email:
- info@annerobsontrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window