Accounts and annual returns GA GA THEATRE

Charity Number: 1179739
Charity reporting is up to date (120 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 October 2024 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 October 2024 120 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 October 2024 486 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 October 2024 486 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 October 2022 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 20 October 2022 112 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 31 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 31 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 15 May 2020 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 15 May 2020 45 days late Download Open in new window