Financial history GA GA THEATRE

Charity number: 1179739
Charity reporting is up to date (120 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.54k £1 £1 £0 £0
Total expenditure £1.05k £818 £818 £1.49k £752
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A