GA GA THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At Ga Ga Theatre we produce shows, festivals and learning experiences designed to include all children, no matter what their situation. We are London based and bring popular books to life in a unique way by combining modern technology with traditional theatre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAURA ELIZABETH BAMFORD | Chair | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
RACHAEL RICHARDS | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
TANYA BARLOW | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATIE RUSSELL | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.54k | £1 | £1 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.05k | £818 | £818 | £1.49k | £752 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 October 2024 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 October 2024 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 October 2024 | 486 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 October 2024 | 486 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 October 2022 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 October 2022 | 112 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 15 May 2020 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | 15 May 2020 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THEATRE AMONG CHILDREN OF ALL AGES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE LIVING IN AN AREA OF SOCIAL DEPRIVATION AND THOSE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS BY PROVIDING THEM WITH ACCESSIBLE AND AGE-APPROPRIATE THEATRE EXPERIENCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Hayes Drive
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
Hertfordshire
CM23 2YJ
- Phone:
- 07970974337
- Email:
- hello@gagatheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window