Financial history THE JOSEPH STONE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 511331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.99k £8.19k £11.18k £12.07k £9.87k
Total expenditure £10.91k £1.90k £2.03k £7.11k £1.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A