SAFA PLACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Safaplace is an young charity that aims to support the positive mental health and wellbeing of students in Stoke Newington School and young people in the wider community. Our aims are to: 1. Support positive mental health and wellbeing of students in Stoke Newington school via education and awareness-raising for all, 2. Make Stoke Newington school a centre for positive mental health aware
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
Governance
- 16 July 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNIE GAMMON | Chair | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Acton | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Salma Asokomhe | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROSE WHITE | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PETER COLLINS | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE FINKE | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.86k | £5.83k | £6.03k | £1.26k | £1.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.55k | £3.94k | £1.13k | £480 | £4.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING AMONG PUPILS OF STOKE NEWINGTON SCHOOL, PEOPLE LIVING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
281 Murchison Road
LONDON
E10 6LT
- Phone:
- 02036692863
- Email:
- safaplacen16@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window