THE ROTHNEY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1176357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Distribution of charity funds

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £2,667
Total expenditure: £74

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 December 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BARRY GIBSON Chair 01 January 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £1.49k £2.67k
Total expenditure £10.70k £81 £122 £1.40k £74
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 18 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 10 October 2024 248 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 10 October 2024 248 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 10 October 2024 613 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 10 October 2024 613 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 10 October 2024 978 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 10 October 2024 978 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 10 October 2024 1343 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 10 October 2024 1343 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Southfield House
Great Rollright
CHIPPING NORTON
Oxfordshire
OX7 5RF
Phone:
07785293728
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available