H M STANLEY HOSPITAL OPHTHALMIC LASER FUND ST ASAPH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide funds for equipment for H M Stanley Eye Unit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
- Wrexham
Governance
- 30 April 1980: Standard registration
- HM STANLEY HOSPITAL OPHTHALMIC EQUIPMENT FUND (Working name)
- H M STANLEY HOSPITAL OPTHALMIC LASER FUND ST ASAPH (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAIRE MORTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Catrin Bertalot | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Manon Morris | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adela Hulpus | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Mathews | Trustee | 02 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
DIVYA MATHEWS | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ARTHUR AIREY | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID CLIFFORD SAUNDERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.93k | £1.05k | £1.33k | £115 | £166.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.80k | £0 | £5 | £61 | £61 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 MARCH 1981 AS AMENDED BY S74 RESOLUTION DATED 16 JANUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DISEASES OF THE EYE BY PROVISION OF AN OPTHALMIC LASER WITH ACCESSORIES OR OTHER SPECIALISED ORTHALMIC EQUIPMENT, FOR USE OF H M STANLEY HOSPITAL ST ASAPH.
Area of benefit
THE CATCHMENT AREA OF H M STANLEY HOSPITAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
208 VICTORIA ROAD
PRESTATYN
LL19 7TL
- Phone:
- 01745852241
- Email:
- laserfund@saunders.wales
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window