LONLAS GOSPEL MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities which support the advancement of the Christian faith primarily but not exclusively within South Wales and the surrounding area (through teaching and preaching from God's word), and which put into practice the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 07 December 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Griffith Emmett | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Holliday | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JAMES WEBBER | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK IOAN DAVIES | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.62k | £63.02k | £56.33k | £66.31k | £63.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.11k | £63.56k | £73.00k | £76.07k | £73.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 25 March 2025 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 25 March 2025 | 206 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 November 2023 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 24 November 2023 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 08 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Dec 2017
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: 1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN SOUTH WALES AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND 2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH IN GENERAL MEETING, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CHURCH FROM TIME TO TIME IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE CHURCH HANDBOOK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lonlas Gospel Mission
Lonlas Avenue
NEATH
West Glamorgan
- Phone:
- 07974778078
- Email:
- lonlasmission@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window