FRIENDS OF NEWCROSS CARE HOME

Charity number: 1176040
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Newcross is a purpose built care home offering Dementia, Nursing, Residential, Respite and End of Life care. The Friends aim to improve the quality of life of the residents of the care home by working with staff, residents and relatives. Alongside this we support the care homes activities coordinators by providing extra pairs of hands during organised activity sessions and outings.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £293

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 December 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID WOOD OBE Chair 18 July 2016
FRIENDS OF AMARNA HOUSE
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ONE TOWER BRIDGE ROAD
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF CEDAR HOUSE
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ASTON HOUSE
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ACACIA MEWS
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF LARCHWOOD
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF MILLINER HOUSE
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ACORN LODGE
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF HORSE FAIR
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF AVERY PLACE
Received: On time
Jenna Hughes Trustee 24 January 2022
None on record
NICHOLE WHEATON Trustee 18 July 2016
THE FRIENDS OF AVERY PLACE
Received: On time
ENFIELD STROKE FRIENDS
Recently registered
THE FRIENDS OF ASTON HOUSE
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF HORSE FAIR
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF MILLINER HOUSE
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ACORN LODGE
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ACACIA MEWS
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF LARCHWOOD
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF AMARNA HOUSE
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ONE TOWER BRIDGE ROAD
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF OAKLANDS CARE HOME
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF CEDAR HOUSE
Received: On time
Matthew Swan Trustee 09 May 2016
ATTEND
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ACACIA MEWS
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF LARCHWOOD
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ACORN LODGE
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF HORSE FAIR
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF AVERY PLACE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.44k £1.50k £0 £1.00k £0
Total expenditure £10.20k £4.17k £949 £942 £293
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11-13 CAVENDISH SQUARE
LONDON
W1G 0AN
Phone:
02073072570