BEAST RAMPZ FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leanne Johnson | Chair | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Allen | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 124 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 124 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 491 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 491 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 856 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 856 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1221 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1221 days | |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1585 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1585 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS PREDOMINANTLY 30 YEARS OLD, AND UNDER WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mounteney Solicitors
22 The Bramhall Centre
Bramhall
STOCKPORT
SK7 1AW
- Phone:
- 01614400131
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window