Financial history BROCKHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1175919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £42.73k £40.17k £41.50k £56.26k £80.31k
Total expenditure £42.96k £27.05k £50.71k £62.54k £68.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £24.97k £8.32k £1.70k £9.00k