FRIENDS OF SUNDERLAND MUSEUMS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The education of the public by promotion, support and assistance, and improvement of the museums in Sunderland administered by Sunderland City Council.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sunderland
Governance
- 12 June 1981: Standard registration
- F O S U M S (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASHLEY SUTHERLAND | Chair | 28 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Donald Yule | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELSIE RONALD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £991 | £290 | £835 | £1.75k | £1.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.27k | £225 | £1.07k | £1.14k | £2.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/02/1981 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/1986 AS AMENDED ON 17/03/2005 AS AMENDED ON 19/02/2009 AS AMENDED ON 08/03/2014
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE MUSEUMS IN SUNDERLAND ADMINISTERED BY TYNE AND WEAR COUNTY COUNCIL.
Area of benefit
SUNDERLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sunderland Museum
Borough Road
Sunderland
SR1 1PP
- Phone:
- 0191 5142235
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window