FALMOUTH VINEYARD CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a new church meeting in Falmouth we have regular Sunday Services where we pray, sing and talk about the teachings of Jesus. We also meet on a Sunday to practically help the local community once a month - refurbishing play areas or painting and cleaning as required by the local community. We meet mid-week as smaller groups to discuss life and the bible and support one another. All are welcome
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 27 November 2017: CIO registration
- FALMOUTH VINEYARD (Working name)
- THE VINEYARD CHURCH - FALMOUTH (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alistair Lockwood | Chair | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Stevenson | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Kite | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Anderson | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Gilbert | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.90k | £57.52k | £94.61k | £114.63k | £126.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.04k | £40.78k | £72.13k | £130.41k | £127.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD THROUGH: THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP; -THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES AND SERVICES AS ARE APPROPRIATE FOR THE CHURCH, TO ENABLE IT TO FULFIL ITS MISSION TO THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH, VISITORS TO THE CHURCH AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY; -THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CHRISTIAN TRAINING AND SERVICE; -THE SUPPORT AND PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN EVANGELISM AND OUTREACH; -THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO THE WIDER CHRISTIAN CHURCH IN ITS MINISTRIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Western Terrace
FALMOUTH
TR11 4QW
- Phone:
- 01326369139
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window