Accounts and annual returns ENFIELD RANGERS YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1176785
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 31 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 20 June 2024 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 20 June 2024 81 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 05 July 2023 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 05 July 2023 96 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 30 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 30 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 28 May 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 28 May 2021 58 days late Download Open in new window