ENFIELD RANGERS YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enfield Rangers Youth Football Club operates youth football from the ages of 5 years up to 18 years of age. We provide training facilities for our volunteer managers and coaches and our players. We have a clubhouse with toilet facilities, changing rooms and refreshments. We are non profit limited company and raise our own funds through fundraising and membership fees and commercial hires.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Enfield
Governance
- 23 January 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Craig Rutter | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CAMPBELL | Trustee | 30 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.32k | £79.75k | £109.44k | £116.21k | £144.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.93k | £86.31k | £88.98k | £111.88k | £136.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 20 June 2024 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 28 May 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 28 May 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHILDREN AND YOUTHS OF ALL AGES LIVING IN OR NEAR THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ENFIELD BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 The Approach
ENFIELD
EN1 3PY
- Phone:
- 020 8805 3078
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window