VALE OF BERKELEY RAILWAY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the history and heritage of the Sharpness Railway Branch Line, by the restoration, preservation and operation of the line or any part or parts thereof including the stations and associated buildings, locomotives and rolling stock as a working museum for the benefit of the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 10 January 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HOWARD PATTEN PARKER | Chair | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Frances Jones | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Gerrard | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bryan George Whitfield | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Woodhall | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edgar Peter Foxton Craggs | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Frank Wooldridge | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CHARLES GOODMAN | Trustee | 20 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.53k | £37.72k | £37.03k | £45.08k | £37.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.33k | £12.31k | £20.90k | £41.84k | £39.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 August 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 29 August 2023 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE SHARPNESS RAILWAY BRANCH LINE, BY THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION AND OPERATION OF THE LINE OR ANY PART OR PARTS THEREOF INCLUDING THE STATION AND ASSOCIATED BUILDINGS, LOCOMOTIVES AND ROLLING STOCK AS A WORKING MUSEUM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oldminster Sidings
Bridge Road
Sharpness
Gloucestershire
GL13 9UX
- Phone:
- 07866727743
- Website:
-
VOBR.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window