BAYCLIFF COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organise various activities for village residents some fund raising some activities subsidised by Baycliff Community Association. Also B.C.A. Funds raised are used for the upkeep of the village park and it's equipment plus some events around the village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 18 May 1981: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY SAPORITA-MOSS | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Elizabeth Monk | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
alan cook | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BRIAN FOX | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ERNEST WHEATLEY | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|||||
MAUREEN RUTH COOK | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUE GILL | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN PARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAMIAN ROBIN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.46k | £366 | £2.85k | £1.80k | £2.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.23k | £1.11k | £985 | £3.69k | £2.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 25 FEBRUARY 1981.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BAYCLIFF AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE.
Area of benefit
BAYCLIFF AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
GLENMORE
MAIN STREET
BAYCLIFF
ULVERSTON
LA12 9RN
- Phone:
- 01229869221
- Email:
- baycliffvillage@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.