Financial history REHOBOTH INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY

Charity number: 1176817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £10.50k £14.66k £19.15k £17.42k £19.45k
Total expenditure £8.90k £12.05k £8.44k £24.19k £23.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A