EASTBRIDGE HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouse foundation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 27 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER ROBINSON | Chair | 27 March 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Stephen Athanasiou | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||
Nigel Aman Fletcher-Jones | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
THE VENERABLE WILLIAM JONATHAN ADAM | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
Robin Joy | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||
The Rev'd Dr Perry Butler | Trustee | 27 March 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 December 2020 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 February 2021 | 117 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION FOR THOSE IN NEED OR SUFFERING HARDSHIP AND UPON SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CIO MAY DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME. THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION AND REPAIR OF THE LAND, BUILDINGS, ARTEFACTS, MUNIMENTS AND DOCUMENTS OF RECORD BELONGING TO EASTBRIDGE HOSPITAL OR WHICH MAY OTHERWISE BE PLACED UNDER ITS CONTROL TO MAKE SUCH PROVISION FOR THE PROMOTION OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP AND LEARNING AMONGST PILGRIMS AND VISITORS TO THE LAND AND BUILDINGS BELONGING TO EASTBRIDGE HOSPITAL OR WHICH MAY OTHERWISE BE PLACED UNDER ITS CONTROL AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CIO MAY DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN OUT OF ITS GENERAL FUNDS SUCH RESOURCES AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CIO MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES (AND IN PARTICULAR THE FURTHERANCE OF CHRISTIAN EDUCATION) INCLUDING THE EASTBRIDGE PARKER EXHIBITION FOR THE BENEFIT OF SCHOLARS AT CORPUS CHRISTI COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE AS LAID DOWN IN A DEED DATED THE 19TH NOVEMBER 1999 AND THE EASTBRIDGE AWARD SCHEME ESTABLISHED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE ATTENDING SCHOOLS (OTHER THAN FEE PAYING SCHOOLS) WITHIN THE CITY OF CANTERBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Eastbridge Hospital
High Street
CANTERBURY
Kent
CT1 2BD
- Phone:
- 01227471688
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window