MARTON-IN-CRAVEN CHURCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for the care and maintenance of St Peter's Church, East Marton, and its ministry
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 02 March 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Toby John Stephenson | Trustee | 06 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Canon Nicholas Anthony Turner MA | Trustee | 02 March 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
DAVID GEORGE HARGRAVES NELSON | Trustee | 02 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
GLENYS TAYLOR | Trustee | 02 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.12k | £7.77k | £6.74k | £8.07k | £5.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £338 | £11.60k | £5.00k | £7.00k | £6.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 02 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE MINISTRY OF WORD AND SACRAMENT, ACCORDING TO THE TEACHING AND PRACTICE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, IN ST PETERÆS CHURCH, EAST MARTON, NORTH YORKSHIRE AND THE MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF SUCH CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ingthorpe Grange
West Marton
SKIPTON
North Yorkshire
BD23 3UH
- Phone:
- 01282844914
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window