JUST CARING MIDLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity seeks to help and support vulnerable young adults in the Birmingham area by reaching out to those who fall through the gaps in the official government services. The charity provides one to one mentoring and a range of group activities, befriending and offering practical advice and support for as long is needed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 22 March 2018: CIO registration
- 13 March 2019: Funds received from 1145933 JUST CARING MIDLANDS
- JUST CARING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GRAEME CAMPBELL FLEMING | Chair | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philip Bell | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MALCOLM BARKER | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil John Parker | Trustee | 02 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAM MOUNTFORD | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARGARET STERRY | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH FRANCES MOUNTFORD | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.46k | £77.19k | £131.62k | £76.93k | £78.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.63k | £59.97k | £58.81k | £63.11k | £67.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES, THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, 'SOCIALLY EXCLUDED' MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS:ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); DISABILITY; INTELLECTUAL OR LEARNING DIFFICULTY; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; LOSS OF SOCIAL SUPPORT NETWORKS; UNEMPLOYMENT AND CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 16206
Kings Heath
Birmingham
B13 3LQ
- Phone:
- 07986631887
- Email:
- phil.bell@justcaring.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window