CHURCHILL FORGE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is involved in restoration of the old forge, together with its wheels and drive belts, in order to preserve something that is part of our national heritage. We feel that it is important to continue and maintain this work, so that the general public and future generations become aware of how things used to be in bygone days, and helped to shape the future .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 15 May 1981: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 March 2012: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Hale | Chair | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maree McGovern | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Willis | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne Luckett | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Kate Hayward | Trustee | 18 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BACHE | Trustee | 24 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM GALLEY | Trustee | 22 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.85k | £92.05k | £8.88k | £2.31k | £3.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.21k | £52.11k | £13.54k | £11.65k | £5.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 APRIL 1981 as amended on 27 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION AND UPKEEP OF THE WATERDRIVEN FORGE KNOWN AS CHURCHILL FORGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN CHURCHILL NEAR KIDDERMINSTER AND THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, SUCH PEMISES BEING OF HISTORICAL, INDUSTRIAL ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
74 WEST STREET
WARWICK
CV34 6AW
- Phone:
- 07504489218
- Email:
- ADMIN@CHURCHILLFORGE.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window