Financial history TENBY CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity Number: 511384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.92k £1.21k £920 £482 £966
Total expenditure £1.08k £1.05k £682 £788 £619
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A